Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ruben Antonio González Medina, C.M.F.

Bishop of Ponce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1949 BornSanturce
1972²22.8Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
9 Feb 197526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
12 Dec 200051.8AppointedBishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico
4 Feb 200151.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico
22 Dec 201566.8AppointedBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
31 Jan 201666.9InstalledBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ruben Antonio González Medina
Bishop Ruben Antonio González Medina C.M.F. (born ) Bishop of Ponce

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ponce.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,899
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2015
  • i: CB, 2 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 4 Feb 2016