Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Harold Anthony Perera

Bishop of Kurunegala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1951 BornBopitiya
5 Jul 198029.1Ordained PriestPriest of Colombo, Sri Lanka
29 Jan 200351.6AppointedBishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka
18 Mar 200351.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka
15 Feb 200553.7AppointedBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
8 Mar 200553.7InstalledBishop of Galle, Sri Lanka
14 May 200957.9AppointedBishop of Kurunegala, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Harold Anthony Perera:
Bishop Harold Anthony Perera (born ) Bishop of Kurunegala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kurunegala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013