Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sergio Pagano, B.

Prefect of the Vatican Secret Archives

Titular Bishop of Celene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1948 Born
19 Oct 197526.9ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
28 May 197829.5Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
7 Jan 199748.1AppointedPrefect of the Vatican Secret Archives
4 Aug 200758.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Celene
29 Sep 200758.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Celene

MicroData Summary for Sergio Pagano
Bishop Sergio Pagano B. (born ) Prefect of Vatican Secret Archives

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Vatican Secret Archives.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Aug 2007
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,527

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast