Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Montréal

Archidioecesis Marianopolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Christian Lépine, Archbishop
  • Thomas Dowd, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Jean-Claude Turcotte, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Jude Saint-Antoine, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Gérard Tremblay, P.S.S., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 8 June 1886
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Québec
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 1,399 (540 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Montreal
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: M
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesemontreal.org/
  • Mailing Address: 2000 Rue Sherbrooke Ouest, Montréal, P.Q. H3H 1G4, Canada
  • Telephone: (514)931-7311
  • Fax: 931-3432

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Montréal
13 May 1836ErectedArchdiocese of Québec Diocese of Montréal (erected)
25 June 1847Territory LostDiocese of Kingston
Diocese of Montréal
Diocese of Bytown (erected)
8 June 1852Territory LostDiocese of Montréal
Archdiocese of Québec
Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe (erected)
Archdiocese of Montréal
8 June 1886ElevatedDiocese of Montréal Archdiocese of Montréal
5 April 1892Territory LostArchdiocese of Montréal Diocese of Valleyfield (erected)
27 January 1904Territory LostArchdiocese of Montréal (Joliette, Berthier, and Montcalm Counties with part of L’Assomption County) Diocese of Joliette (erected)
9 June 1933Territory LostArchdiocese of Montréal Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Québec (erected)
23 June 1951Territory LostDiocese of Mont-Laurier
Archdiocese of Montréal
Archdiocese of Ottawa
Diocese of Saint-Jérôme (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Montréal
1950998,3991,315,00075.9%8311,1221,9535113,64310,128207ap1951
19661,348,8701,897,26071.1%9221,4102,3325781,41910,220257ap1967
19701,529,0842,191,44269.8%9111,4002,3116612,62710,032258ap1971
19761,725,6072,297,50175.1%7921,3182,1108172,49610,088258ap1977
19801,506,2202,151,75070.0%7701,1871,9577692,2778,336257ap1981
19901,375,0002,148,50064.0%8189401,758782671,7007,023254ap1991
19991,570,6502,201,53571.3%6468281,4741,0651001,4695,576251ap2000
20001,570,6502,249,12369.8%6328051,4371,093981,4105,442250ap2001
20011,570,6502,246,47169.9%6077961,4031,1191041,3725,275246ap2002
20021,570,6502,287,15668.7%5987301,3281,1821031,2404,972237ap2003
20031,570,6502,252,56669.7%6017151,3161,1931041,2064,823229ap2004
20041,590,1502,340,92867.9%5846991,2831,2391031,1794,702219ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Sep 2014