Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Cristóbal de Las Casas

Dioecesis Sancti Christophori de las Casas



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)
19 March 1539ErectedDiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca Diocese of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas) (erected)
12 February 1546Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas) (From Seville (Spain) to Mexico (Mexico))
19 June 1957Territory LostDiocese of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas) Diocese of Tapachula (erected)
27 October 1964Territory LostDiocese of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas) Diocese of Tuxtla Gutiérrez (erected)
Diocese of San Cristóbal de Las Casas
27 October 1964Name ChangedDiocese of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas) Diocese of San Cristóbal de Las Casas
25 November 2006Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of San Cristóbal de Las Casas (from Antequera, Oaxaca)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)
1949623,641628,49899.2%303020,7884640ap1951
1958609,092625,16397.4%3343716,46175232ap1960
Diocese of San Cristóbal de Las Casas
1966611,000637,50095.8%33205311,528288927ap1967
1968611,000637,50095.8%6025857,1883710729ap1971
1976756,400787,95096.0%38276511,6364713539ap1977
1980840,000908,00092.5%34276113,7704314438ap1981
1990870,5001,200,00072.5%35276214,040694818050ap1991
1999974,3361,454,23367.0%25315617,3983114115744ap2000
20001,186,8461,543,24576.9%24305421,9783364420538ap2001
2001995,3221,531,37265.0%28346216,0533374419137ap2002
2002995,3221,531,37265.0%37367313,6343425520946ap2003
2003995,3221,531,31265.0%4544920,3123415316848ap2004
2004995,3221,707,05958.3%46388411,8493405819051ap2005
20101,346,0001,691,00079.6%49398815,2953295620752ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014