Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Archidioecesis Sancti Sebastiani Fluminis Ianuarii



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Orani João Tempesta, O. Cist., Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Edson de Castro Homem, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Paulo César Costa, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Roque Costa Souza, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Pedro Cunha Cruz, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Antônio Augusto Dias Duarte, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Luiz Henrique da Silva Brito, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Eusébio Oscar Scheid, S.C.I., Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Assis Lopes, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 27 April 1892
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Rio de Janeiro
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 1,261 (487 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste I
  • Web Site: http://www.arquidiocese.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Rua Benjamin Constant 23, Gloria, 20241-150 Rio de Janeiro, RJ, Brazil
  • Telephone: (021)2292-3132
  • Fax: 2242-9295; 2252-1182

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
19 July 1575ErectedDiocese of São Salvador da Bahia Territorial Prelature of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro (erected)
Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
16 November 1676ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
6 December 1745Territory LostDiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro Territorial Prelature of Cuiabá (erected)
6 December 1745Territory LostDiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro Territorial Prelature of Goiás (erected)
6 December 1745Territory LostDiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro Diocese of Mariana (erected)
6 December 1745Territory LostDiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro Diocese of São Paulo (erected)
27 April 1892Territory LostDiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy) (erected)
Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
27 April 1892ElevatedDiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
15 August 1907Territory LostDiocese of Amazonas
Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Territorial Abbey of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro (erected)
6 May 2003Territory AddedTerritorial Abbey of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro (suppressed) Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
19501,400,0002,000,00070.0%2502865362,6114142,205105ap1951
19622,800,0003,500,00080.0%2644056694,1855232,453138ap1967
19703,400,1224,651,66973.1%2374096465,2635192,950194ap1971
19763,684,2004,251,91886.6%2715618324,42816652,467198ap1977
19804,790,2195,443,43188.0%2553856407,48435541,999208ap1981
19904,945,0006,097,00081.1%2523305828,496104261,991226ap1991
19994,491,0005,677,00079.1%2772985757,810333651,634238ap2000
20003,880,0745,598,95369.3%2852785636,891333841,260240ap2001
20013,880,0125,598,86369.3%2742855596,940353711,299241ap2002
20024,041,9545,857,90469.0%2983156136,593334111,228242ap2003
20034,059,5275,857,90469.3%3182645826,975343611,214242ap2004
20043,556,0955,857,89560.7%3142785926,006423841,117246ap2005
20103,737,0006,158,00060.7%3232796026,207124390654252ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014