Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dicastery for Evangelization

Dicasterium pro Evandelizatione



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jorge Mario Bergoglio, S.J., Prefect
  • Salvatore Rino Fisichella, Pro-Prefect
  • Luis Antonio Gokim Tagle, Cardinal, Pro-Prefect
  • Fortunatus Nwachukwu, Secretary
  • Emilio Nappa, Adjunct Secretary
  • Graham Bell, Under Secretary
  • Graziano Borgonovo, Under Secretary
  • Samuele Sangalli, Under Secretary
  • Franz-Peter Tebartz-van Elst, Official
  • Piergiuseppe Vacchelli, Official Emeritus
  • José Octavio Ruiz Arenas, Secretary Emeritus
  • Ryszard Szmydki, O.M.I., Secretary Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Dicastery
  • United: 5 June 2022
  • Curial Office
  • Roman Curia
  • Description: Is competent for fundamental questions regarding evangelization in the world and for the establishment, assistance and support of new particular Churches (Praedicate Evangelium, 53)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.pcpne.va/
  • Official Web Site: http://www.novaevangelizatio.va/

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
22 June 1622EstablishedCongregation for Propagation of the Faith
1 May 1917EstablishedCongregation for Propagation of the Faith Congregation for the Oriental Churches
Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
15 August 1967Name ChangedCongregation for Propagation of the Faith Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
Dicastery for Evangelization
5 June 2022UnitedCongregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
Pontifical Council for Promoting the New Evangelization
Dicastery for Evangelization

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 17 Feb 2024