Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michael F. Cardinal Czerny, S.J.

Under Secretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development

Cardinal-Deacon of San Michele Arcangelo

Titular See: (Migrants and Refugees Section)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1946 Born
14 Aug 196418.0EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
9 Jun 197326.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Dec 201670.4AppointedUnder Secretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
1 Jan 201770.4InstalledUnder Secretary of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
23 Sep 201973.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Beneventum
4 Oct 201973.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Beneventum
5 Oct 201973.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 201973.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Michele Arcangelo
19 Jan 202073.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Michele Arcangelo

MicroData Summary for Michael F. Czerny (VIAF: 107713590)
Michael F. Cardinal Czerny S.J. (born ) Under Secretary of Promoting Integral Human Development

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrno, Diocese of Brno, Czech Republic
Ordained PriestRegis, College, Willowdale, Ontario, Archdiocese of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • mi/loc: CB, 4 Sep 2019
  • ob: CB, 10 Sep 2019
  • c2: CB, 11 Sep 2019
  • 2b45: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2019
  • c34: CB, 4 Oct 2019
  • cdea: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,249
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Oct 2019
  • ab: CB, 9 Oct 2019
  • i: Bollettino, 13 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 May 2020

Quantcast