Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cape Coast

Archidioecesis A Litore Aureo



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 April 1950
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ghana
  • Square Kilometers: 9,788 (3,780 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archdiocesan Secretariat, P.O. Box 112, Cape Coast, Ghana
  • Telephone: (042)33.471/2
  • Fax: 33.473

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}
27 September 1879ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées} Prefecture Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast} (erected)
28 June 1895Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast} Prefecture Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}
25 May 1901ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast} Vicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}
15 March 1923Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast}
Vicariate Apostolic of Togo
Vicariate Apostolic of Volta Inferiore (erected)
2 February 1932Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast} Vicariate Apostolic of Kumasi (erected)
2 December 1943Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast} Prefecture Apostolic of Accra (erected)
Archdiocese of Cape Coast
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast} Archdiocese of Cape Coast
20 November 1969Territory LostArchdiocese of Cape Coast Diocese of Sekondi-Takoradi (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Cape Coast
1950120,494716,28616.8%1045552,19022618ap1951
1959195,505910,00021.5%2064842,327133826ap1960
1969285,0791,675,00017.0%2947763,751636724ap1971
1980175,9471,028,00017.1%1727443,998394813ap1981
1990215,4221,252,39617.2%5614703,077356613ap1991
1998259,1981,934,12013.4%778853,04911710120ap2001
2001269,0291,587,94016.9%91101012,6632110421ap2002
2002275,3911,603,81917.2%93111042,647229621ap2003
2003282,7741,595,87917.7%7911903,14112710423ap2004
2004287,5981,603,85817.9%8512972,9642410825ap2005
2006293,1311,699,10517.3%99101092,6893111241ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013