Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Lokoja

Dioecesis Lokoianus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 5 May 1965
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Abuja
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 24,750 (9,559 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Maryville, P.O. Box 172, Lokoja, Kogi State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (058)22.01.60

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kabba
21 February 1955ErectedDiocese of Benin City
Diocese of Kaduna
Prefecture Apostolic of Oturkpo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kabba (erected)
Diocese of Kabba
6 July 1964ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kabba Diocese of Kabba
Diocese of Lokoja
5 May 1965Name ChangedDiocese of Kabba Diocese of Lokoja
26 September 1968Territory LostDiocese of Lokoja Prefecture Apostolic of Idah (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Lokoja
196912,514650,0001.9%214167821489ap1971
198024,2211,095,0002.2%87151,614471210ap1981
199032,7301,061,0003.1%104142,337443211ap1991
199935,7921,388,0002.6%261271,325412715ap2000
200036,5071,465,5302.5%261271,352413315ap2001
200138,0441,349,0102.8%261271,409413616ap2002
200238,9781,624,5902.4%301311,257413917ap2003
200339,9521,734,2642.3%294331,210444316ap2004
200436,5071,465,5302.5%35237986423515ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 3 Jul 2013