Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Moolachira

Archbishop of Guwahati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1951 BornPuthusserykadavu
23 Oct 197826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Tezpur, India
14 Feb 200755.2AppointedBishop of Diphu, India
15 Apr 200755.3Ordained BishopBishop of Diphu, India
9 Apr 201159.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Guwahati, India
18 Jan 201260.1SucceededArchbishop of Guwahati, India

MicroData Summary for John Moolachira:
Archbishop John Moolachira (born ) Archbishop of Guwahati

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Guwahati.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,403
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Apr 2011
  • s: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013