Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Mamede Filho, O.F.M. Conv.

Bishop of Umuarama, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1951 Born
20 Feb 197422.4Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
21 Apr 197826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
26 Apr 200654.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
26 Apr 200654.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania
1 Jul 200654.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania
24 Nov 201059.2AppointedBishop of Umuarama, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Mamede Filho
Bishop João Mamede Filho O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of Umuarama

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaçapava

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Umuarama.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2006
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,202
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast