Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Maung Bo, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Yangon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1948 BornMohla
9 Apr 197627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 May 198637.5AppointedPrefect of Lashio, Myanmar
7 Jul 199041.7AppointedBishop of Lashio, Myanmar
16 Dec 199042.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lashio, Myanmar
13 Mar 199647.4AppointedBishop of Pathein, Myanmar
15 May 200354.5AppointedArchbishop of Yangon, Myanmar
7 Jun 200354.6InstalledArchbishop of Yangon, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Charles Maung Bo:
Archbishop Charles Maung Bo S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Yangon

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Yangon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,537
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1990, Page 1,012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 3 Feb 2014