Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Asmara (Ethiopian)

Eparchia Asmarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Menghesteab Tesfamariam, M.C.C.I., Bishop
  • Zekarias Yohannes, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Eparchy
  • Elevated: 20 February 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archeparchy of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian)
  • Ethiopian Catholic Church of the Alexandrian Tradition
  • Country: Eritrea
  • Square Kilometers: 23,686 (9,148 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Addi Keih Street 19, P.O. Box 244, Asmara, Eritrea
  • Telephone: (01) 120.206
  • Fax: 120.239

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Ordinariate of Eritrea (Ethiopian)
4 July 1930ErectedOrdinariate of Eritrea (Ethiopian) (erected)
Apostolic Exarchate of Asmara (Ethiopian)
31 October 1951ElevatedOrdinariate of Eritrea (Ethiopian) Apostolic Exarchate of Asmara (Ethiopian)
Eparchy of Asmara (Ethiopian)
20 February 1961ElevatedApostolic Exarchate of Asmara (Ethiopian) Eparchy of Asmara (Ethiopian)
21 December 1995Territory LostEparchy of Asmara (Ethiopian) Eparchy of Barentu (Ethiopian) (erected)
21 December 1995Territory LostEparchy of Asmara (Ethiopian) Eparchy of Keren (Ethiopian) (erected)
24 February 2012Territory LostEparchy of Asmara (Ethiopian) Eparchy of Segheneity (Ethiopian) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Ordinariate of Eritrea (Ethiopian)
195026,186900,0002.9%8383315138965ap1951
Apostolic Exarchate of Asmara (Ethiopian)
Eparchy of Asmara (Ethiopian)
196642,4631,200,0003.5%9152143296979384ap1971
197555,8008310218530113019272ap1981
199060,78078108186326418128287ap1991
199946,3032,927,2801.6%3414317726120839370ap2000
200044,6462,927,2801.5%3317120421824639260ap2001
200144,6462,927,2801.5%3317120421824639260ap2002
200249,5193,027,2801.6%38199237208304475138ap2003
200354,7123,500,0001.6%4120324422433249465ap2004
200458,6243,900,0001.5%4122326422230248466ap2005
200662,4534,010,0001.6%44287331188253562866ap2007
200966,4434,250,0001.6%43276319208354269969ap2010
201070,3514,500,0001.6%48326374188370764669ap2011
201267,3143,934,0001.7%21340361186370384774ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013