Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Santo Domingo

Archidioecesis Sancti Dominici



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 12 February 1546
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Dominican Republic
  • Square Kilometers: 4,032 (1,557 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 186, Calle Isabel la Católica 55, Santo Domingo, República Dominicana
  • Telephone: (809)685-3141/3
  • Fax: 688-7270; 685-8702

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Santo Domingo
8 August 1511ErectedDiocese of Santo Domingo (erected)
18 December 1534Territory LostDiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of Santiago de Guatemala (erected)
Archdiocese of Santo Domingo
12 February 1546ElevatedDiocese of Santo Domingo Archdiocese of Santo Domingo
3 October 1861Territory LostArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince (erected)
3 October 1861Territory LostArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of Les Cayes (erected)
3 October 1861Territory LostArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of Les Gonaïves (erected)
3 October 1861Territory LostArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of Cap-Haïtien (erected)
3 October 1861Territory LostArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of Port-de-Paix (erected)
25 September 1953Territory LostArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of La Vega (erected)
25 September 1953Territory LostArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Territorial Prelature of San Juan de la Maguana (erected)
25 September 1953Territory LostArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of Santiago de los Caballeros (erected)
25 September 1953ElevatedArchdiocese of Santo Domingo (becomes a Metropolitan (again))
1 April 1959Territory LostArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey (erected)
8 November 1986Territory LostArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of Baní (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Santo Domingo
19502,165,0002,185,00099.1%4111715813,7029433165ap1951
1964996,3901,016,77598.0%341411755,69323261142ap1967
19701,084,8181,356,07380.0%241792035,34325872165ap1971
19761,573,9981,748,88690.0%292212506,29532179782ap1977
19801,941,0002,066,00093.9%352112467,890532879783ap1981
19901,736,0001,925,00090.2%531852387,29416586647109ap1991
19992,502,6172,634,33495.0%872383257,70019430808141ap2000
20002,524,7172,698,89893.5%992433427,38221394802137ap2001
20012,586,8932,874,32690.0%1052533587,22522425838152ap2002
20022,810,7782,960,55694.9%1192643837,33823483869161ap2003
20032,895,1013,049,37294.9%1492644137,00944392888171ap2004
20043,110,3113,274,01295.0%1392694087,62368372894186ap2005
20104,890,2505,770,52984.7%17428345710,7001555432,226212ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Aug 2014