Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franco Giulio Brambilla

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1949 Born
7 Jun 197525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
13 Jul 200758.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
13 Jul 200758.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tullia
23 Sep 200758.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tullia
24 Nov 201162.4AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
5 Feb 201262.5InstalledBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Franco Giulio Brambilla
Bishop Franco Giulio Brambilla (born ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMissaglia, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Novara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,520
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2011
  • i: CB, 9 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018