Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlos Cardinal Aguiar Retes

Archbishop of México, Federal District

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Fabiano e Venanzio a Villa Fiorelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1950 Born
24 Dec 197121.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tepic, Nayarit, México
22 Apr 197323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tepic, Nayarit, México
28 May 199747.3AppointedBishop of Texcoco, México, México
29 Jun 199747.4Ordained BishopBishop of Texcoco, México, México
5 Feb 200959.0AppointedArchbishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México
31 Mar 200959.2InstalledArchbishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México
19 Nov 201666.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 201666.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Fabiano e Venanzio a Villa Fiorelli
11 Jun 201767.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Fabiano e Venanzio a Villa Fiorelli
7 Dec 201767.9AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
5 Feb 201868.0InstalledArchbishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Carlos Aguiar Retes
Carlos Cardinal Aguiar Retes (born ) Archbishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTepic, Diocese of Tepic, Nayarit
Ordained PriestCathedral, Tepic, Diocese of Tepic, Nayarit
Ordained BishopFeria del Caballo, Texcoco, Diocese of Texcoco, México

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,029
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016
  • i: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2017
  • i: CB, 10 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast