Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aldo Cavalli

Apostolic Nuncio to Netherlands

Titular Archbishop of Vibo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1946 BornMaggianico di Lecco, Italy
18 Mar 197124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
199649.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Angola
2 Jul 199649.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vibo
2 Jul 199649.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to São Tomé and Príncipe
26 Aug 199649.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Vibo
1 Sep 199750.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Angola
28 Jun 200154.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
29 Oct 200761.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
16 Feb 201366.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
13 Apr 201366.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Libya
21 Mar 201568.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Aldo Cavalli:
Archbishop Aldo Cavalli (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Netherlands

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Netherlands.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,783
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015