Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Solomon Amanchukwu Amatu

Bishop of Okigwe, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1950 Born
7 Oct 197827.8Ordained PriestPriest of Awka, Nigeria
22 Dec 200050.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Awka, Nigeria
22 Dec 200050.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sabrata
28 Apr 200150.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sabrata
28 May 200554.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Okigwe, Nigeria
22 Apr 200655.3SucceededBishop of Okigwe, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Solomon Amanchukwu Amatu
Bishop Solomon Amanchukwu Amatu (born ) Bishop of Okigwe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUkpo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Okigwe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,966

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018