Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jackson

Dioecesis Jacksoniensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Richard Kopacz, Bishop
  • William Russell Houck, Bishop Emeritus
  • Joseph Nunzio Latino, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Mississippi
18 July 1826ErectedDiocese of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans) Vicariate Apostolic of Mississippi (erected)
Diocese of Natchez
28 July 1837ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Mississippi Diocese of Natchez (erected) (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
19 July 1850Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Natchez (to New Orleans)
Diocese of Natchez-Jackson
18 December 1956Name ChangedDiocese of Natchez Diocese of Natchez-Jackson
1 March 1977Territory LostDiocese of Natchez-Jackson Diocese of Biloxi (erected)
Diocese of Jackson
1 March 1977Name ChangedDiocese of Natchez-Jackson Diocese of Jackson

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Natchez
195050,5592,183,7962.3%687414235612338066ap1951
Diocese of Natchez-Jackson
196674,3432,178,2413.4%1328421634417849697ap1967
197082,3832,161,4813.8%111801914311138425106ap1971
197686,7732,324,0003.7%109701794841140398112ap1977
Diocese of Jackson
198042,5851,724,0002.5%744311736395429973ap1981
199046,4101,920,0002.4%623395488104527575ap1991
199945,4081,980,0252.3%67329945871228974ap2000
200047,3341,994,0112.4%58298754474327574ap2001
200147,8731,994,0112.4%58308854484224074ap2002
200248,8081,994,9462.4%55348954814822274ap2003
200351,3471,997,4852.6%52288064174322874ap2004
200451,9921,998,1302.6%50297965874321274ap2005
200651,0002,130,0002.4%49307964574421874ap2007
201252,5002,203,0002.4%47338065644115675ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 8 Feb 2014