Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Asunción

Archidioecesis Sanctissimae Assumptionis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 1 May 1929
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Paraguay
  • Square Kilometers: 2,582 (997 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arzobispado.org.py/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Avda. Mariscal Lopez 130, esq. Independencia Nacional, Asuncion, Paraguay
  • Telephone: (021)44-3187; 44-5551; 44-4150
  • Fax: 44-4150

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Paraguay
1 July 1547ErectedDiocese of Cuzco Diocese of Paraguay (erected)
6 April 1620Territory LostDiocese of Paraguay Diocese of Buenos Aires (erected)
1 May 1929Territory LostDiocese of Paraguay
Prefecture Apostolic of Pilcomayo
Diocese of Concepción y Chaco (erected)
1 May 1929Territory LostDiocese of Paraguay Diocese of Villarrica (erected)
Archdiocese of Asunción
1 May 1929ElevatedDiocese of Paraguay Archdiocese of Asunción
19 January 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Asunción
Diocese of Villarrica
Diocese of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones (erected)
2 August 1960Territory LostArchdiocese of Asunción
Diocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
Territorial Prelature of Caacupé (erected)
18 May 2000Territory LostArchdiocese of Asunción Diocese of San Lorenzo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Asunción
1950695,000700,00099.3%44701146,0967018044ap1951
1959686,000712,00096.3%73751484,63511229348ap1960
1966501,880550,88091.1%771282052,44812531049ap1967
1968501,880550,88091.1%86865,83548ap1971
1976672,165746,85090.0%711141853,63321240969ap1977
1980735,764817,51690.0%631402033,62420946066ap1981
19901,164,3181,293,68790.0%741652394,87133257279ap1991
1999919,0001,483,00062.0%71301019,0994521356873ap2000
20001,100,0001,348,95181.5%53671209,1663439864760ap2001
2001774,0001,602,17348.3%1362183542,186514561,38673ap2002
20021,365,0002,825,00048.3%1412183593,802514651,43883ap2003
20031,350,0001,500,00090.0%1395376761,997517261,42372ap2004
20041,350,0001,500,00090.0%1245376612,042576791,42372ap2005
20061,419,0001,577,00090.0%1285376652,133647821,44764ap2007
20121,585,0001,750,00090.6%611702316,8616540848576ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014