Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Job Koo Yobi, Ist. del Prado

Auxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Sfasferia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1951 Born
24 Feb 198130.0Ordained PriestPriest of Seoul, Korea (South)
28 Jun 201766.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
28 Jun 201766.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sfasferia
17 Aug 201766.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sfasferia

MicroData Summary for Job Koo Yobi
Bishop Job Koo Yobi Ist. del Prado (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Seoul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGapyeong, Prefecture Apostolic of Chunchon
Ordained BishopCathedral, Seoul, Archdiocese of Seoul

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Seoul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2017
  • bp/ob: CB, 28 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Aug 2017