Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Our Lady of Deliverance in the United States (Syrian)

Eparchia Dominae Nostrae Liberationis Novarcensis Syrorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Eparchy of Our Lady of Deliverance of Newark (Syrian)
6 November 1995ErectedEparchy of Our Lady of Deliverance of Newark (Syrian) (erected)
7 January 2016Territory LostEparchy of Our Lady of Deliverance of Newark (Syrian) Apostolic Exarchate of Canada (Syrian) (erected)
Eparchy of Our Lady of Deliverance in the United States (Syrian)
29 July 2021Name ChangedEparchy of Our Lady of Deliverance of Newark (Syrian) Eparchy of Our Lady of Deliverance in the United States (Syrian) ((date uncertain))

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Our Lady of Deliverance of Newark (Syrian)
199911,7807181,4723111ap2000
200011,9208191,3243111ap2001
200112,18091101,2182110ap2002
200212,39091101,2392111ap2003
200312,84291101,2841110ap2004
200413,14091101,3142111ap2005
200713,800662,30029ap2010
201325,00023231,08658ap2014
201612,60011111,145313ap2017
201911,857131148464111ap2020
Eparchy of Our Lady of Deliverance in the United States (Syrian)

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.7, 8 May 2021; Data: 7 Aug 2021

Quantcast