Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elías Samuel Bolaños Avelar, S.D.B.

Bishop of Zacatecoluca, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1951 Born
27 Oct 197928.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Feb 199847.0AppointedBishop of Zacatecoluca, El Salvador
25 Mar 199847.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zacatecoluca, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Elías Samuel Bolaños Avelar
Bishop Elías Samuel Bolaños Avelar S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Zacatecoluca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCutumay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zacatecoluca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast