Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Peter Kodwo Appiah Cardinal Turkson

Chancellor of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of San Liborio

Note(s): (Chancellor/P.A. of Science & P.A. of Social Science)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1948 Born
20 Jul 197526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cape Coast, Ghana
6 Oct 199243.9AppointedArchbishop of Cape Coast, Ghana
27 Mar 199344.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cape Coast, Ghana
21 Oct 200355.0Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200355.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Liborio
18 Apr 200455.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Liborio
24 Oct 200961.0AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
28 Feb 201364.3CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
16 Mar 201364.4ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
31 Aug 201667.8AppointedPrefect of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
1 Jan 201768.2CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
1 Jan 202273.2ResignedPrefect of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
4 Apr 202273.4AppointedChancellor of the Roman Curia - Other
6 Jun 202273.6InstalledChancellor of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Peter Kodwo Appiah Turkson
(VIAF: 26330636; WikiData: Q546121)
Peter Kodwo Appiah Cardinal Turkson (born ) Chancellor of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWassaw Nsuta, Archdiocese of Cape Coast, Ghana
Ordained BishopSaint Francis de Sales, Cathedral, Cape Coast, Archdiocese of Cape Coast, Ghana

Please contact the Cardinal through the Roman Curia - Other.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,064
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Aug 2016
  • bpd/c.i: AM, 29 Sep 2021
  • i: Bollettino, 5 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 19 Jul 2023