Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Manenti

Bishop of Senigallia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1951 Born
28 Jun 197524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Crema, Italy
17 Oct 201564.3AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
22 Nov 201564.4Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
10 Jan 201664.5InstalledBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Manenti
Bishop Francesco Manenti (born ) Bishop of Senigallia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSergnano, Diocese of Crema
Ordained PriestCathedral, Crema, Diocese of Crema
Ordained BishopCathedral, Crema, Diocese of Crema

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Senigallia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2015
  • ob: CB, 17 Oct 2015
  • c2+: CB, 22 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,675
  • loc: AM, 1 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast