Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Salzburg

Archidioecesis Salisburgensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Franz Lackner, O.F.M., Archbishop
  • Andreas Laun, O.S.F.S., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Georg Eder, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Alois Kothgasser, S.D.B., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 April 798
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Austria
  • Square Kilometers: 9,715 (3,752 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.kirchen.net/
  • Mailing Address: Kapitelplatz 2, Postfach 62, A-5010 Salzburg, Oesterreich
  • Telephone: (0662)80.47.1100
  • Fax: 80.47.1009

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Salzburg
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Salzburg (erected)
Archdiocese of Salzburg
20 April 798ElevatedDiocese of Salzburg Archdiocese of Salzburg
6 March 1071Territory LostArchdiocese of Salzburg Diocese of Gurk (erected)
28 January 1216Territory LostArchdiocese of Salzburg Diocese of Chiemsee (erected)
22 June 1218Territory LostArchdiocese of Salzburg Diocese of Seckau (erected)
10 May 1228Territory LostArchdiocese of Salzburg Diocese of Lavant (erected)
28 January 1785Territory LostDiocese of Passau
Archdiocese of Salzburg
Diocese of Leoben (erected)
1 April 1818Territory AddedDiocese of Chiemsee (suppressed) Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}
Archdiocese of Salzburg

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Salzburg
1950370,000430,00086.0%4081715796392481,305199ap1951
1970473,556517,94991.4%3661795458683331,072204ap1971
1980531,000540,00098.3%3301604901,0832244913206ap1981
1990520,367579,94189.7%2891404291,21212243717206ap1991
1999250,161643,70638.9%2529734971629206499207ap2000
2000518,341676,70176.6%251913421,51532184489207ap2001
2001516,767677,00076.3%252923441,50232188478210ap2002
2002520,456682,82676.2%249913401,53030179451205ap2003
2003514,019682,82675.3%240883281,56733170436208ap2004
2004513,126682,82675.1%234823161,62337155418208ap2005
2010497,378708,84770.2%213842971,67438155369210ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Sep 2014