Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchisedec Sikuli Paluku

Bishop of Butembo-Beni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1952 BornLukanga
21 Aug 197826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Butembo-Beni, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Apr 199846.2AppointedBishop of Butembo-Beni, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Aug 199846.5Ordained BishopBishop of Butembo-Beni, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Melchisedec Sikuli Paluku:
Bishop Melchisedec Sikuli Paluku (born ) Bishop of Butembo-Beni

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Butembo-Beni.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,363

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Jun 2014