Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy Lawrence Doherty

Bishop of Lafayette in Indiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1950 BornRockford, IL
26 Jun 197625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rockford, Illinois, USA
12 May 201059.6AppointedBishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA
15 Jul 201059.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Timothy Lawrence Doherty:
Bishop Timothy Lawrence Doherty (born ) Bishop of Lafayette in Indiana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lafayette in Indiana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,758

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013