Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Antonysamy

Archbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1952 Born
19 Nov 198028.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tiruchirapalli, India
4 Aug 200553.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sulci
4 Aug 200553.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea
4 Aug 200553.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Liberia
4 Aug 200553.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gambia
20 Sep 200553.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sierra Leone
21 Sep 200553.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sulci
8 Sep 200856.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea
21 Nov 201260.7AppointedArchbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India

MicroData Summary for George Antonysamy (VIAF: 89053441)
Archbishop George Antonysamy (born ) Archbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTiruchy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tiruchirapalli, Diocese of Tiruchirapalli

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Aug 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,978
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast