Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Dennis Kagan

Bishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1949 Born
14 Jun 197525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rockford, Illinois, USA
19 Oct 201161.9AppointedBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
30 Nov 201162.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
18 Jul 201262.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
19 Jun 201363.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Fargo, North Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for David Dennis Kagan
Bishop David Dennis Kagan (born ) Bishop of Bismarck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaukegan, IL

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bismarck.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2011
  • ob/c1: CB, 19 Oct 2011
  • c2+: CB, 28 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,184
  • ab: CB, 12 Jul 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast