Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Re

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Bishops

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1934 BornBorno, Italy
3 Mar 195723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
9 Oct 198753.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Forum Novum
9 Oct 198753.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Bishops
7 Nov 198753.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Forum Novum
12 Dec 198955.9AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
16 Sep 200066.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
16 Sep 200066.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Latin America
21 Feb 200167.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
21 Feb 200167.1Elevated to Cardinal
18 Mar 200167.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
1 Oct 200268.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto
22 Dec 200268.9InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto
2 Apr 200571.2CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
2 Apr 200571.2CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Latin America
21 Apr 200571.2ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
21 Apr 200571.2ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Latin America
30 Jun 201076.4RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
30 Jun 201076.4RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Latin America

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Re:
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Re (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Bishops

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for Bishops.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 8 Nov 2014