Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch RaphaŽl Bedros XXI Minassian, I.C.P.B.

Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1946 Born
24 Jun 197326.5Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergť Patriarcal de Bzommar
26 Sep 200558.8AppointedPatriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem and Amman {Gerusalemme e Amman} (Armenian), Palestine
24 Jun 201164.5AppointedOrdinary of Eastern Europe {Europa Orientale} (Armenian)
24 Jun 201164.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia degli Armeni
16 Jul 201164.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia degli Armeni
23 Sep 202174.8ElectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
23 Sep 202174.8ElectedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon
23 Sep 202174.8ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
24 Oct 202174.9InstalledPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for RaphaŽl Bedros XXI Minassian
Patriarch RaphaŽl Bedros XXI Minassian I.C.P.B. (born ) Patriarch of Cilicia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeirut
Ordained BishopSaint Grťgoire l`Illuminateur-Saint …lie, Cathedral, Beirut

Please contact the Patriarch through the Patriarchate of Cilicia (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 7
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 22 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,116
  • bd: CB, 24 Jul 2021
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Sep 2021
  • i: AM, 5 Oct 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Oct 2021

Quantcast