Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard Bober

Archbishop of Košice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1950 BornZbudské Dlhé
8 Jun 197423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Košice, Slovakia
28 Dec 199242.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Košice, Slovakia
28 Dec 199242.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
30 Jan 199342.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
4 Jun 201059.6AppointedArchbishop of Košice, Slovakia
10 Jul 201059.7InstalledArchbishop of Košice, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Bernard Bober:
Archbishop Bernard Bober (born ) Archbishop of Košice

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Košice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,999

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013