Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bellary

Dioecesis Bellaryensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Henry D’Souza, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 March 1949
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bangalore
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 24,973 (9,645 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bellarydiocese.in/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Cantonment, Bellary-583104, Karnataka, India
  • Telephone: (08392)240.315; 240.308
  • Fax: 240.308

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bellary
15 June 1928ErectedDiocese of Hyderabad
Archdiocese of Madras
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bellary (erected)
Diocese of Bellary
10 March 1949ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Bellary Diocese of Bellary
24 June 2005Territory LostDiocese of Belgaum (Bijapur)
Diocese of Bellary (Gulbarga)
Archdiocese of Hyderabad (Bidar)
Diocese of Gulbarga (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bellary
19506,5953,000,000.2%8152328661ap1951
195910,2626,000,000.2%710176039112ap1960
19709,3443,398,399.3%1412263591311316ap1971
198014,9365,150,000.3%30838393914921ap1981
199018,8935,382,393.4%45348393417426ap1991
199925,1046,113,504.4%5111624041120643ap2000
200025,4506,496,450.4%5114653911421744ap2001
200125,7026,617,902.4%5213653951320344ap2002
200226,2756,627,975.4%5217693801721644ap2003
200326,4456,671,245.4%5222743572221844ap2004
200426,6466,680,846.4%5223753552322244ap2005
200626,3284,142,000.6%5821793332117641ap2007
201229,2624,848,448.6%6525903253820741ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 May 2014