Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gervas Rozario

Bishop of Rajshahi, Bangladesh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1951 Born
31 Dec 198029.3Ordained PriestPriest of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
20 May 199038.7IncardinatedPriest of Rajshahi, Bangladesh
15 Jan 200755.4AppointedBishop of Rajshahi, Bangladesh
22 Mar 200755.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rajshahi, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Gervas Rozario
Bishop Gervas Rozario (born ) Bishop of Rajshahi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStiangaccha

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rajshahi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast