Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana

Dioecesis Segobricensis-Castellionensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 31 May 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Valencia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Spain
  • Square Kilometers: 4,380 (1,691 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.obsegorbecastellon.es/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Paseo Obispo Ahedo 2, 12400 Segorbe [Castellon], Espana; Palacio Episcopal, Gobernador Bermudez de Castro 8, 12003 Castellon de la Plana, Espana
  • Telephone: 964.710.276; 964.220.066
  • Fax: 964.225.882

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Segorbe
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Segorbe (erected)
Diocese of Segorbe-Albarracin
18 March 1258UnitedDiocese of Albarracin
Diocese of Segorbe
Diocese of Segorbe-Albarracin
21 July 1577SplitDiocese of Segorbe-Albarracin Diocese of Albarracin
Diocese of Segorbe
Diocese of Segorbe
21 July 1577SplitDiocese of Segorbe-Albarracin Diocese of Albarracin
Diocese of Segorbe
Diocese of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana
31 May 1960Name ChangedDiocese of Segorbe Diocese of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Segorbe
195080,00080,020100.0%56419782446869ap1951
Diocese of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana
1970310,189310,43099.9%193742671,161122640148ap1971
1980363,446364,30899.8%180632431,495104574148ap1981
1990382,094383,47499.6%163662291,6683106534148ap1991
1999386,815388,23899.6%159612201,758376402148ap2000
2000395,306396,75799.6%159762351,6824102457128ap2001
2001395,306396,75799.6%162762381,6604102450127ap2002
2002398,566401,37799.3%173752481,607489470148ap2003
2003402,965412,99097.6%156842401,679491422148ap2004
2004420,301440,74695.4%169762451,715488430146ap2005
2010434,100510,72585.0%197252221,955336385147ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 17 Feb 2014