Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kaohsiung

Dioecesis Kaohsiungensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 21 March 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Taipei
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Taiwan
  • Square Kilometers: 5,723 (2,210 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.khs-catholic.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 125 Szu-wei 3rd Road, Kaohsiung 80250, Taiwan
  • Telephone: (07)331.01.69
  • Fax: 333.45.83

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa)
13 July 1913ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa) (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaohsiung
30 December 1949Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa) Prefecture Apostolic of Kaohsiung
Diocese of Kaohsiung
21 March 1961ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kaohsiung Diocese of Kaohsiung

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaohsiung
195010,4314,879,178.2%314176131411210ap1951
Diocese of Kaohsiung
197050,0572,412,6532.1%1761786417012854ap1971
198048,9313,206,5001.5%2058786277811753ap1981
199046,1523,368,9281.4%1967865367614555ap1991
199946,0813,600,8211.3%2171925008414762ap2000
200046,2483,614,8721.3%2072925027414362ap2001
200146,4543,626,2061.3%2665915107014062ap2002
200246,4353,637,9201.3%1772895217614858ap2003
200347,1063,649,0831.3%1865835676714362ap2004
200447,2213,650,5911.3%1770875427114157ap2005
200648,0003,697,0001.3%2862905336313158ap2007
201145,9503,646,9921.3%32528454715312259ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 13 Jul 2013