Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Glen John Provost

Bishop of Lake Charles, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1949 Born
29 Jun 197525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
6 Mar 200757.5AppointedBishop of Lake Charles, Louisiana, USA
23 Apr 200757.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lake Charles, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Glen John Provost
Bishop Glen John Provost (born ) Bishop of Lake Charles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLafayette

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lake Charles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,407

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast