Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrews Thazhath

Archbishop of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1951 BornPudukad
14 Mar 197725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India
18 Mar 200452.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India
18 Mar 200452.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aptuca
1 May 200452.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aptuca
22 Jan 200755.1AppointedArchbishop of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India
18 Mar 200755.2InstalledArchbishop of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Andrews Thazhath:
Archbishop Andrews Thazhath (born ) Archbishop of Trichur

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Trichur (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,582

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 28 Aug 2015