Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Australia



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Split: 5 March 1973
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Australia
  • Mailing Address: 2 Vancouver St., Red Hill, Canberra ACT 2603; P.O. Box 3633, Manuka, ACT 2603, Australia
  • Telephone: (61)2.6295.3876
  • Fax: 2.6295.3690

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Australia
15 April 1914EstablishedDelegation to Australia
Delegation to Australia, New Zealand and Oceania
1947Name ChangedDelegation to Australia Delegation to Australia, New Zealand and Oceania
Delegation to Australia and Papua New Guinea
1 November 1968SplitDelegation to Australia, New Zealand and Oceania Delegation to Australia and Papua New Guinea
Delegation to New Zealand and Pacific Islands
5 March 1973SplitDelegation to Australia and Papua New Guinea Delegation to Papua New Guinea
Nunciature to Australia (and Elevated)
Nunciature to Australia
5 March 1973SplitDelegation to Australia and Papua New Guinea Delegation to Papua New Guinea
Nunciature to Australia (and Elevated)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.3, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 10 Feb 2020

Quantcast