Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando José Castro Aguayo

Auxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Ampora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1951 BornCaracas
31 May 198432.8Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
27 Jun 200957.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
27 Jun 200957.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ampora
26 Sep 200958.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ampora

MicroData Summary for Fernando José Castro Aguayo:
Bishop Fernando José Castro Aguayo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013