Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Osman, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Barentu (Eritrean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1950 BornLemuna
10 Jul 197727.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Oct 200151.3AppointedBishop of Barentu (Eritrean), Eritrea
13 Jan 200251.6Ordained BishopBishop of Barentu (Eritrean), Eritrea

MicroData Summary for Thomas Osman:
Bishop Thomas Osman O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Barentu

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Barentu (Eritrean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015