Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dicastery for the Clergy

Dicasterium pro Clericis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Lazzaro You Heung-sik, Cardinal, Prefect
  • Andrés Gabriel Ferrada Moreira, Secretary
  • Simone Renna, Under Secretary
  • Beniamino Stella, Cardinal, Prefect Emeritus
  • Joël Michel Marie Luc Mercier, Secretary Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Dicastery
  • Elevated: 5 June 2022
  • Curial Office
  • Roman Curia
  • Description: Deals with all matters relating to priests and deacons of the diocesan clergy, with regard to their persons and pastoral ministry, and everything needed for the fruitful exercise of the latter (Praedicate Evangelium, 113)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.clerus.va/
  • Mailing Address: Palazzo delle Congregazioni, 00193 Roma, Piazza Pio XII, 3
  • Telephone: 06.69.88.41.51
  • Fax: 06.69.88.48.45

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Congregation for Cardinals Interpreters of the Council of Trent
2 August 1564EstablishedCongregation for Cardinals Interpreters of the Council of Trent
Congregation of the Council
16th CenturyName ChangedCongregation for Cardinals Interpreters of the Council of Trent Congregation of the Council
Congregation for the Clergy
15 August 1967Name ChangedCongregation of the Council Congregation for the Clergy
Dicastery for the Clergy
5 June 2022ElevatedCongregation for the Clergy Dicastery for the Clergy

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Dicastery for the Clergy
    • Annuario Pontificio, Year 2023, Page 1,182, and Page 1,184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 6 Apr 2024