Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Graham Rose

Bishop of Dundee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1951 BornEvander
12 Dec 198029.0Ordained PriestPriest of Johannesburg, South Africa
13 Jun 200856.5AppointedBishop of Dundee, South Africa
30 Aug 200856.7Ordained BishopBishop of Dundee, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Thomas Graham Rose:
Bishop Thomas Graham Rose (born ) Bishop of Dundee

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dundee.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,952

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013