Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Santa Fe

Archidioecesis Sanctae Fidei in America Septentrionali



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Santa Fe
23 July 1850ErectedDiocese of Santa Fe (erected)
1868Territory LostDiocese of Santa Fe Vicariate Apostolic of Arizona (erected)
1868Territory LostDiocese of Santa Fe Vicariate Apostolic of Colorado and Utah (erected)
Archdiocese of Santa Fe
12 February 1875ElevatedDiocese of Santa Fe Archdiocese of Santa Fe
16 December 1939Territory LostArchdiocese of Santa Fe
Diocese of Tucson
Diocese of Gallup (erected)
17 August 1982Territory LostDiocese of El Paso
Archdiocese of Santa Fe
Diocese of Las Cruces (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Santa Fe
1950205,000450,00045.6%115751901,0789656071ap1951
1966252,317656,38938.4%14713227990418562689ap1967
1970678,650.0%1221292510275440ap1971*
1976300,000800,00037.5%130822121,4152217635394ap1977
1980325,000822,00039.5%126802061,5774116840695ap1981
1990300,000841,00035.7%1291042331,28711017730992ap1991
1999257,2581,044,37624.6%106891951,3191369127391ap2000
2000275,9551,045,42026.4%124842081,32614719126391ap2001
2001286,1551,071,23826.7%127922191,30614619625492ap2002
2002287,0551,083,06926.5%131822131,34714318924692ap2003
2003307,4361,111,07127.7%129852141,43614218323592ap2004
2004254,1101,260,38520.2%128862141,18719917324593ap2005
2010314,1831,429,00022.0%126862121,48121616717392ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014