Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Monterrey

Archidioecesis Monterreyensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 9 June 1922
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Nuevo León
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 17,886 (6,908 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Noreste
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesismty.org/
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 7, Zuazua 1100, 64000 Monterrey, N.L., México
  • Telephone: (8)345-24-66
  • Fax: 345-35-57

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Linares o Nueva León
15 December 1777ErectedDiocese of Michoacán Diocese of Linares o Nueva León (erected)
1839Territory LostDiocese of Linares o Nueva León Prefecture Apostolic of Texas (erected)
13 August 1861Territory LostDiocese of Linares o Nueva León Vicariate Apostolic of Tamaulipas (erected)
26 January 1863Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Linares o Nueva León (From Mexico (Mexico) to Guadalajara (Mexico))
23 June 1891Territory LostDiocese of Linares o Nueva León Diocese of Saltillo (erected)
Archdiocese of Linares o Nueva León
23 June 1891ElevatedDiocese of Linares o Nueva León Archdiocese of Linares o Nueva León
Archdiocese of Monterrey
9 June 1922Name ChangedArchdiocese of Linares o Nueva León Archdiocese of Monterrey
30 April 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Monterrey Diocese of Linares (erected)
6 November 1989Territory LostDiocese of Matamoros
Archdiocese of Monterrey
Diocese of Nuevo Laredo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Monterrey
19661,104,8001,118,80098.7%126431696,53714071150ap1967
19701,408,108.0%13245177015970350ap1971
19761,353,2511,408,10896.1%167572246,04119068962ap1977
19801,987,0002,070,00096.0%177452228,95013251871ap1981
19904,410,0004,900,00090.0%2049329714,8483177670132ap1991
19994,285,0004,600,00093.2%2881434319,9416215774149ap2000
20004,324,5004,650,00093.0%3101274379,8957229735153ap2001
20014,500,0004,720,00095.3%3211344559,8906205755155ap2002
20024,470,8074,807,32093.0%3331224559,82518217775166ap2003
20034,640,7305,407,92585.8%3461635099,11723302458172ap2004
20045,146,2116,809,34575.6%34616350910,11025298750178ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 20 Nov 2014