Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kagoshima

Dioecesis Kagoshimaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul Kenjiro Koriyama, Bishop
  • Paul Shinichi Itonaga, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 25 February 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nagasaki
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Japan
  • Square Kilometers: 9,187 (3,548 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: 13-42 Terukuni-cho, Kagoshima-shi 892-0841, Japan
  • Telephone: (099)226-5100
  • Fax: 225-0440

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kagoshima
18 March 1927ErectedDiocese of Nagasaki Prefecture Apostolic of Kagoshima (erected)
Diocese of Kagoshima
25 February 1955ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kagoshima Diocese of Kagoshima
18 December 1972Territory LostDiocese of Kagoshima Diocese of Naha (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Kagoshima
19506671,766,514.0%441664117ap1951
Diocese of Kagoshima
19709,0161,801,529.5%1133442044716817ap1971
19808,8221,772,261.5%1631471874225023ap1981
19909,4981,810,341.5%2124452113023528ap1991
19999,0251,782,654.5%2123442052721828ap2000
20009,0631,787,376.5%1922412212621129ap2001
20019,1261,779,273.5%1822402282721229ap2002
20029,3211,782,333.5%1823412272820429ap2003
20039,3221,778,575.5%1722392392819929ap2004
20049,2871,773,301.5%2125462013018729ap2005
20069,5081,769,932.5%17244123123017328ap2007
20119,2811,698,500.5%19234222062813330ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 11 Dec 2014