Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Francisco Cardinal Robles Ortega

Archbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Presentazione


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1949 BornMascota
20 Jul 197627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Autlán, Jalisco, México
30 Apr 199142.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toluca, México, México
30 Apr 199142.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bossa
5 Jun 199142.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bossa
15 Jun 199647.3AppointedBishop of Toluca, México, México
15 Jul 199647.4InstalledBishop of Toluca, México, México
25 Jan 200353.9AppointedArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
28 Apr 200354.2InstalledArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
24 Nov 200758.7Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200758.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Presentazione
25 Oct 200859.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Presentazione
7 Dec 201162.8AppointedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
7 Feb 201262.9InstalledArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Robles Ortega:
José Francisco Cardinal Robles Ortega (born ) Archbishop of Guadalajara

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,600
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Mar 2014