Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joel Matthias Konzen, S.M.

Auxiliary Bishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA

Titular Bishop of Leavenworth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1950 Born
1975²24.1ProfessedMember of Society of Mary
1978²27.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Mary
19 May 197928.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
5 Feb 201867.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
5 Feb 201867.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Leavenworth
3 Apr 201867.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leavenworth

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joel Matthias Konzen
Bishop Joel Matthias Konzen S.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Atlanta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOak Harbor, Diocese of Toledo (in America), Ohio
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Atlanta, Archdiocese of Atlanta, Georgia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Atlanta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2018
  • ob: Website of the Diocese, 5 Feb 2018
  • c2+: CB, 24 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 Jun 2019

Quantcast